Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Workgroup on the COVID-19 Crisis Economic Recovery
Sponsored by
Senator Rosapepe
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing the Workgroup on the COVID-19 Economic Recovery; providing for the composition, chair, and staffing of the Workgroup; requiring the Workgroup to study and make recommendations regarding the challenges posed by the COVID-19 pandemic; requiring the Workgroup to submit an interim report to the Governor and the General Assembly on or before December 31, 2021 and a final report on or before December 31, 2022; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2021
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
Creates a Task Force or Commission
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/09/2021
Legislative Date
2/09/2021
Action
First Reading Finance and Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Workgroup on the COVID-19 Crisis Economic Recovery
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/11/2021
Legislative Date
2/11/2021
Action
Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/09/2021 2/09/2021 First Reading Finance and Budget and Taxation
Text - First - Workgroup on the COVID-19 Crisis Economic Recovery
Senate 2/11/2021 2/11/2021 Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance)
Statutes
Last Updated: 4/1/2021 6:27 PM
Click to return on the top page