Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Cemeteries - Perpetual Care Trust Fund - Loan of Principal for Capital Expenditures
Sponsored by
Senator Klausmeier
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing a percentage not to exceed 2% of the principal of a perpetual care trust fund to be loaned to a specified person that established the perpetual care trust fund to be used for specified capital expenditures; providing for the term and interest rate of a specified loan; and requiring a specified person to include a description of a specified loan, including specified information, in a specified report submitted to the Director of the Office of Cemetery Oversight.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0949
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/08/2016
Legislative Date
2/05/2016
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/17/2016
Legislative Date
2/17/2016
Action
Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/19/2016
Legislative Date
2/19/2016
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/19/2016
Legislative Date
2/19/2016
Action
Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/08/2016 2/05/2016 First Reading Finance
Senate 2/17/2016 2/17/2016 Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/19/2016 2/19/2016 Hearing cancelled
Senate 2/19/2016 2/19/2016 Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM