Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Earned Income Tax Credit - Individuals Without Qualifying Children - Calculation and Refundability
Sponsored by
Senators Zucker and Griffith
Status
In the Senate - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Synopsis
Altering the calculation of the Maryland earned income tax credit to allow certain individuals without qualifying children to claim an increased credit; allowing certain individuals to claim a refund of the credit; and applying the Act to taxable years beginning after December 31, 2020.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0176
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0719 Session: 2020 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/09/2021
Legislative Date
2/09/2021
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/11/2021
Legislative Date
2/11/2021
Action
Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/01/2021
Legislative Date
3/01/2021
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/09/2021
Legislative Date
3/09/2021
Action
Withdrawn by Sponsor
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/09/2021 2/09/2021 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Text - First - Earned Income Tax Credit - Individuals Without Qualifying Children - Calculation and Refundability
Senate 2/11/2021 2/11/2021 Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/01/2021 3/01/2021 Hearing canceled
Senate 3/09/2021 3/09/2021 Withdrawn by Sponsor
Last Updated: 3/5/2021 5:31 PM
Click to return on the top page