Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Safety - Investigation of an Officer-Involved Death (Law Enforcement Trust and Transparency Act)
Sponsored by
Senator Carter
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/12 at 9:30 a.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring each law enforcement agency to develop and implement a policy requiring the investigation of a certain officer-involved death; requiring that the policy require the investigation to be performed by at least two investigators who have certain qualifications; requiring the investigators to submit a certain report to a certain State's Attorney at a certain time; requiring the investigators to release the report to the public under certain circumstances; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0983
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/14/2019
Legislative Date
2/14/2019
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/21/2019
Legislative Date
2/22/2019
Action
Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/22/2019
Legislative Date
2/22/2019
Action
Hearing 3/12 at 12:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/07/2019
Legislative Date
3/07/2019
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/07/2019
Legislative Date
3/07/2019
Action
Hearing 3/12 at 9:30 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/14/2019 2/14/2019 First Reading Senate Rules
Text - First - Public Safety - Investigation of an Officer-Involved Death (Law Enforcement Trust and Transparency Act)
Senate 2/21/2019 2/22/2019 Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/22/2019 2/22/2019 Hearing 3/12 at 12:00 p.m.
Senate 3/07/2019 3/07/2019 Hearing canceled
Senate 3/07/2019 3/07/2019 Hearing 3/12 at 9:30 a.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   3-507.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:35 PM