Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Vehicle Laws - Rental Vehicles - Driver's License Verification and Records
Sponsored by
Senators Beidle and West
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/03 at 12:00 p.m.
Analysis
Synopsis
Prohibiting a vehicle lessor from renting a vehicle to another person unless the lessor verifies that the person's driver's license is not expired; authorizing a vehicle lessor to meet certain inspection and verification requirements related to the driver's license of a vehicle lessee through electronic or digital means; authorizing a vehicle lessor to keep certain records in an electronic or digital format; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1013
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2020
Legislative Date
2/03/2020
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2020
Legislative Date
2/05/2020
Action
Reassigned to Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
21
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2020
Legislative Date
2/06/2020
Action
Hearing 3/03 at 12:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/03/2020 2/03/2020 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Vehicle Laws - Rental Vehicles - Driver's License Verification and Records
Senate 2/05/2020 2/05/2020 Reassigned to Judicial Proceedings 21
Senate 2/06/2020 2/06/2020 Hearing 3/03 at 12:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/6/2020 5:33 PM