Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Offshore Wind - Application for Proposed Project - Evaluation and Approval
Sponsored by
Senators Waugh, Astle, Bates, Cassilly, DeGrange, Edwards, Jennings, Klausmeier, Middleton, Miller, Norman, Ready, Serafini, and Simonaire
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Public Service Commission to evaluate the extent to which an applicant's plan for a specified proposed offshore wind project directly or indirectly encroaches on existing private, State, federal, or military infrastructure, resources, facilities, ranges, or operating environments; and prohibiting the Commission from approving an applicant's proposed offshore wind project unless the proposed offshore wind project will not impact specified restricted areas and a specified warning area in a specified manner.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/03/2015
Legislative Date
3/04/2015
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2015
Legislative Date
3/18/2015
Action
Rereferred to Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2015
Legislative Date
3/19/2015
Action
Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 3/03/2015 3/04/2015 First Reading Senate Rules
Senate 3/17/2015 3/18/2015 Rereferred to Finance
Senate 3/19/2015 3/19/2015 Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM