Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Statewide Building Codes - Maryland Accessibility Code - Enforcement
Sponsored by
Senators Muse and Zirkin
Status
In the House - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (99-37)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing an occupant, a dependent of an occupant, or a prospective tenant who otherwise meets the requirements for tenancy to commence a civil action to obtain relief for a violation of the Maryland Accessibility Code with regard to a building of four or more dwelling units that is subject to the Code; requiring a specified individual to provide written notice to a property manager, landlord, or rental agent before filing a complaint under the Act; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1279
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/08/2013
Legislative Date
2/11/2013
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/20/2013
Legislative Date
2/20/2013
Action
Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/22/2013
Legislative Date
2/22/2013
Action
Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2013
Legislative Date
4/01/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2013
Legislative Date
3/27/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {434137/1
Proceedings
58
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2013
Legislative Date
3/27/2013
Action
Special Order until 4/2 (Senator Kittleman) Adopted
Proceedings
58
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2013
Legislative Date
3/28/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {434137/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2013
Legislative Date
3/28/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2013
Legislative Date
3/29/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (34-13)
Proceedings
60
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2013
Legislative Date
3/28/2013
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
61
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2013
Legislative Date
4/05/2013
Action
Rereferred to Environmental Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/08/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environmental Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/03/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {930216/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
67
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/03/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
67
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/05/2013
Action
Special Order until later today (Delegate Dumais) Adopted
Proceedings
69
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/05/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (99-37)
Proceedings
69
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/08/2013 2/11/2013 First Reading Senate Rules
Senate 2/20/2013 2/20/2013 Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/22/2013 2/22/2013 Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/29/2013 4/01/2013 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/01/2013 3/27/2013 Favorable with Amendments {434137/1 58
Senate 4/01/2013 3/27/2013 Special Order until 4/2 (Senator Kittleman) Adopted 58
Senate 4/02/2013 3/28/2013 Favorable with Amendments {434137/1 Report Adopted 59
Senate 4/02/2013 3/28/2013 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 59
Senate 4/03/2013 3/29/2013 Third Reading Passed (34-13) 60
House 4/03/2013 3/28/2013 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations 61
House 4/05/2013 4/05/2013 Rereferred to Environmental Matters
House 4/08/2013 4/08/2013 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environmental Matters
House 4/08/2013 4/03/2013 Favorable with Amendments {930216/1 Report Adopted 67
House 4/08/2013 4/03/2013 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 67
House 4/08/2013 4/05/2013 Special Order until later today (Delegate Dumais) Adopted 69
House 4/08/2013 4/05/2013 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (99-37) 69
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   12-202 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM