Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Transportation - Chesapeake Bay Bridge Crossing - Environmental Impact Study - Cost Estimate and Payment
Sponsored by
Senators Hershey, Astle, Brinkley, Colburn, Edwards, Kittleman, Klausmeier, Mathias, and Pugh
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Explicitly stating the power of the Maryland Transportation Authority to conduct or coordinate a study of the environmental impact of proposed transportation facilities; requiring the Maryland Transportation Authority, in collaboration with specified other agencies, to develop a cost estimate for an Environmental Impact Study for a third crossing of the Chesapeake Bay; requiring the Maryland Transportation Authority to set aside a sum of money each year for the Environmental Impact Study, as specified; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2014
Legislative Date
1/31/2014
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2014
Legislative Date
2/05/2014
Action
Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/03/2014 1/31/2014 First Reading Finance
Senate 2/05/2014 2/05/2014 Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   4-205, 4-407 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM