Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Frederick County - Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Sponsored by
Senators Young and Hough
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 205
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing in Frederick County a Class B-CC (conference center) license, a Class B license, and a Class MEC (micro-brewery/entertainment center) license; specifying requirements for the licensed establishments; specifying the types of alcoholic beverages that may be sold for on-premises consumption in locations at the licensed establishments; providing for the hours of sale and license fees; requiring that the Board of License Commissioners define a specified term; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1240
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/03/2015
Legislative Date
3/04/2015
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/05/2015
Legislative Date
3/06/2015
Action
Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2015
Legislative Date
3/06/2015
Action
Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2015
Legislative Date
3/23/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/23/2015
Legislative Date
3/20/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {544635/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
47A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/23/2015
Legislative Date
3/20/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
47A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/24/2015
Legislative Date
3/21/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
48
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/25/2015
Legislative Date
3/23/2015
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
53
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/25/2015
Legislative Date
3/25/2015
Action
Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2015
Legislative Date
4/09/2015
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2015
Legislative Date
4/03/2015
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2015
Legislative Date
4/03/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2015
Legislative Date
4/04/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (139-0)
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2015
Legislative Date
4/04/2015
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/12/2015
Legislative Date
5/12/2015
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 205
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 3/03/2015 3/04/2015 First Reading Senate Rules
Senate 3/05/2015 3/06/2015 Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/06/2015 3/06/2015 Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/20/2015 3/23/2015 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/23/2015 3/20/2015 Favorable with Amendments {544635/1 Report Adopted 47A
Senate 3/23/2015 3/20/2015 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 47A
Senate 3/24/2015 3/21/2015 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 48
House 3/25/2015 3/23/2015 First Reading Economic Matters 53
House 3/25/2015 3/25/2015 Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/08/2015 4/09/2015 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 4/09/2015 4/03/2015 Favorable Report Adopted 64
House 4/09/2015 4/03/2015 Second Reading Passed 64
House 4/10/2015 4/04/2015 Third Reading Passed (139-0) 65
Senate 4/11/2015 4/04/2015 Returned Passed 62
Post Passage 5/12/2015 5/12/2015 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 205
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   2-208, 6-201, 8-211, 9-102 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM