Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Criminal Law - Veterans - Medical Marijuana
Sponsored by
Senator Young
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Adding posttraumatic stress disorder under a definition of "debilitating medical condition" for the purposes of specified affirmative defenses to a charge of use or possession of marijuana; establishing a specified affirmative defense for a charge of use or possession of marijuana for a specified qualified veteran patient; establishing a specified written certification for a qualified veteran patient; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1452
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/08/2016
Legislative Date
2/05/2016
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2016
Legislative Date
2/10/2016
Action
Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/10/2016
Legislative Date
3/11/2016
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/08/2016 2/05/2016 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/10/2016 2/10/2016 Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/10/2016 3/11/2016 Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   5-601 )
(   24-1701 through 24-1705 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM