Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Economic Development - Cyber Workforce Program and Fund - Established
Sponsored by
Senator Hester
Status
In the House - Hearing 4/12 at 11:45 a.m. (Economic Matters)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing the Cyber Workforce Program in the Partnership for Workforce Quality Program; providing for the purpose of the Cyber Program; requiring the Secretary of Commerce to direct the Cyber Program; requiring the Secretary to establish certain criteria and priorities for assistance under the Cyber Program; requiring the Secretary to submit a certain report on the operation and performance of the Cyber Program; establishing the Cyber Workforce Fund as a special, nonlapsing fund; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/09/2021
Legislative Date
2/09/2021
Action
First Reading Finance and Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Economic Development - Cyber Workforce Program and Fund - Established
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2021
Legislative Date
2/10/2021
Action
Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2021
Legislative Date
4/09/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2021
Legislative Date
3/19/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {327371/1 Adopted
Proceedings
44 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2021
Legislative Date
3/19/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
44 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Economic Development - Cyber Workforce Program and Fund - Established
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2021
Legislative Date
3/19/2021
Action
Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day Const/Rule 24 (Senator King) Adopted
Proceedings
44 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2021
Legislative Date
3/19/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
44 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2021
Legislative Date
3/25/2021
Action
Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
44 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2021
Legislative Date
4/10/2021
Action
Rereferred to Economic Matters and Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2021
Legislative Date
4/10/2021
Action
Hearing 4/12 at 11:45 a.m. (Economic Matters)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/09/2021 2/09/2021 First Reading Finance and Budget and Taxation
Text - First - Economic Development - Cyber Workforce Program and Fund - Established
Senate 2/10/2021 2/10/2021 Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance)
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/09/2021 4/09/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 4/09/2021 3/19/2021 Favorable with Amendments {327371/1 Adopted 44 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/09/2021 3/19/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 44 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Economic Development - Cyber Workforce Program and Fund - Established
Senate 4/09/2021 3/19/2021 Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day Const/Rule 24 (Senator King) Adopted 44 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/09/2021 3/19/2021 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 44 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/09/2021 3/25/2021 Referred Rules and Executive Nominations 44 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/10/2021 4/10/2021 Rereferred to Economic Matters and Appropriations
House 4/10/2021 4/10/2021 Hearing 4/12 at 11:45 a.m. (Economic Matters)
(   3-401,   3-413 through 3-417 )
Last Updated: 4/13/2021 1:32 PM
Click to return on the top page