Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Highway Administration - Construction and Maintenance - Permit Requirements (Nighttime Construction Noise Reduction Act)
Sponsored by
Senator Smith
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting the State Highway Administration from issuing a permit for work to be conducted on State highways between 10:00 p.m. and 6:00 a.m. the following day unless a zoning official determines that issuing the permit is in the interest of public safety, health, or welfare; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0084
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2020
Legislative Date
2/03/2020
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2020
Legislative Date
2/07/2020
Action
Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/21/2020
Legislative Date
2/21/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/24/2020
Legislative Date
2/24/2020
Action
Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/03/2020 2/03/2020 First Reading Finance
Text - First - State Highway Administration - Construction and Maintenance - Permit Requirements (Nighttime Construction Noise Reduction Act)
Senate 2/07/2020 2/07/2020 Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/21/2020 2/21/2020 Hearing canceled
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 2/24/2020 2/24/2020 Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/24/2020 10:54 AM