Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Law Enforcement Officers' Pension System - Reemployment of Retirees
Sponsored by
Senator Robey
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring retirees of the Law Enforcement Officers' Pension System who are reemployed under specified circumstances to terminate participation in a Deferred Retirement Option Program and receive a specified lump sum payment before being reemployed by the Natural Resources Police Force; requiring that specified retirees of the Law Enforcement Officers' Pension System who are reemployed and injured under specified circumstances receive a specified adjustment to their retirement allowance; requiring a specified report; etc.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Opposite:
Appropriations  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1426
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/11/2013
Legislative Date
2/11/2013
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/20/2013
Legislative Date
2/20/2013
Action
Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/27/2013
Legislative Date
2/27/2013
Action
Hearing 3/07 at 8:30 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2013
Legislative Date
3/06/2013
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2013
Legislative Date
3/06/2013
Action
Hearing 3/07 at 9:00 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2013
Legislative Date
3/22/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2013
Legislative Date
3/20/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {789138/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
51
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2013
Legislative Date
3/20/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
51
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/25/2013
Legislative Date
3/21/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
52
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/26/2013
Legislative Date
3/22/2013
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
55A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/26/2013
Legislative Date
3/26/2013
Action
Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/11/2013 2/11/2013 First Reading Senate Rules
Senate 2/20/2013 2/20/2013 Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/27/2013 2/27/2013 Hearing 3/07 at 8:30 a.m.
Senate 3/06/2013 3/06/2013 Hearing cancelled
Senate 3/06/2013 3/06/2013 Hearing 3/07 at 9:00 a.m.
Senate 3/21/2013 3/22/2013 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/22/2013 3/20/2013 Favorable with Amendments {789138/1 Report Adopted 51
Senate 3/22/2013 3/20/2013 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 51
Senate 3/25/2013 3/21/2013 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 52
House 3/26/2013 3/22/2013 First Reading Appropriations 55A
House 3/26/2013 3/26/2013 Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   26-403, 26-403.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM