Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Electric Vehicles and Recharging Equipment - Rebates and Tax Credits
Sponsored by
Senators Manno, Ramirez, Feldman, King, Madaleno, and Peters
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 359
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Repealing the credit against the State income tax for the costs of purchasing qualified electric vehicle recharging equipment; establishing, for fiscal years 2015 through 2017, the Electric Vehicle Recharging Equipment Rebate Program to provide rebates to individuals and specified entities for the costs of acquiring and installing vehicle recharging equipment; requiring the Maryland Energy Administration and Department of Transportation to report to specified committees of the General Assembly by January 1, 2015; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1345
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2014
Legislative Date
1/31/2014
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation and Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2014
Legislative Date
2/05/2014
Action
Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m. (Budget and Taxation)
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2014
Legislative Date
3/20/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2014
Legislative Date
3/15/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {149230/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2014
Legislative Date
3/15/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2014
Legislative Date
3/16/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
50
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/24/2014
Legislative Date
3/19/2014
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
55
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/26/2014
Legislative Date
3/26/2014
Action
Rereferred to Environmental Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2014
Legislative Date
3/27/2014
Action
Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2014
Legislative Date
4/04/2014
Action
Favorable Report by Environmental Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2014
Legislative Date
3/28/2014
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2014
Legislative Date
3/28/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2014
Legislative Date
3/29/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (115-19)
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/28/2014
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/05/2014
Legislative Date
5/05/2014
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 359
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/03/2014 1/31/2014 First Reading Budget and Taxation and Finance
Senate 2/05/2014 2/05/2014 Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m. (Budget and Taxation)
Senate 3/19/2014 3/20/2014 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/20/2014 3/15/2014 Favorable with Amendments {149230/1 Report Adopted 49
Senate 3/20/2014 3/15/2014 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 49
Senate 3/21/2014 3/16/2014 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 50
House 3/24/2014 3/19/2014 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations 55
House 3/26/2014 3/26/2014 Rereferred to Environmental Matters
House 3/27/2014 3/27/2014 Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/03/2014 4/04/2014 Favorable Report by Environmental Matters
House 4/04/2014 3/28/2014 Favorable Report Adopted 64
House 4/04/2014 3/28/2014 Second Reading Passed 64
House 4/05/2014 3/29/2014 Third Reading Passed (115-19) 65
Senate 4/07/2014 3/28/2014 Returned Passed 62
Post Passage 5/05/2014 5/05/2014 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 359
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   9-2001, 9-2009, 9-20B-05 )
(   10-729 )
(   13-815 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM