Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Benefit Corporations - Purposes, Duties of Directors, and Liability
Sponsored by
Senators Klausmeier and Raskin
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the purpose of a Maryland benefit corporation; clarifying that a director of a benefit corporation is required to perform the director's duties in accordance with a specified standard; authorizing a director to consider the effects of a specified action or decision; providing that a director may not be required to give priority to a specified interest or factor over any other interest or factor; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0978 Session: 2014 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/05/2015
Legislative Date
3/06/2015
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/09/2015
Legislative Date
3/09/2015
Action
Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2015
Legislative Date
3/16/2015
Action
Hearing 3/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 3/05/2015 3/06/2015 First Reading Senate Rules
Senate 3/09/2015 3/09/2015 Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/16/2015 3/16/2015 Hearing 3/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   5-6C-01, 5-6C-06, 5-6C-07, 5-6C-09 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM