Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Tri-County Council for Southern Maryland - Financing Purchase or Lease of Property by Other Entities
Sponsored by
Senator Middleton
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 207
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing the Tri-County Council for Southern Maryland to use specified money to finance the purchase or lease of property only by one or more specified Southern Maryland counties, the Maryland Food Center Authority, or another entity, as determined by the Council, that is authorized to finance or purchase property; requiring the Council, under specified circumstances and in accordance with specified provisions of law, to issue a request for and to evaluate proposals and to select an entity to purchase or lease property; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Opposite:
Economic Matters  
Details
Emergency Bill
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): Upon Enactment
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/05/2015
Legislative Date
3/06/2015
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2015
Legislative Date
3/18/2015
Action
Rereferred to Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2015
Legislative Date
3/17/2015
Action
Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2015
Legislative Date
3/20/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2015
Legislative Date
3/20/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {117772/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2015
Legislative Date
3/20/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/24/2015
Legislative Date
3/21/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
48
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/25/2015
Legislative Date
3/23/2015
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
53
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/25/2015
Legislative Date
3/25/2015
Action
Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2015
Legislative Date
4/08/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2015
Legislative Date
4/02/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {773196/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
63
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2015
Legislative Date
4/02/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
63
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2015
Legislative Date
4/03/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (139-0)
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2015
Legislative Date
4/03/2015
Action
Senate Concur - House Amendments
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2015
Legislative Date
4/03/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2015
Legislative Date
4/03/2015
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/12/2015
Legislative Date
5/12/2015
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 207
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 3/05/2015 3/06/2015 First Reading Senate Rules
Senate 3/17/2015 3/18/2015 Rereferred to Finance
Senate 3/17/2015 3/17/2015 Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/19/2015 3/20/2015 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 3/20/2015 3/20/2015 Favorable with Amendments {117772/1 Report Adopted 47
Senate 3/20/2015 3/20/2015 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 47
Senate 3/24/2015 3/21/2015 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 48
House 3/25/2015 3/23/2015 First Reading Economic Matters 53
House 3/25/2015 3/25/2015 Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/07/2015 4/08/2015 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 4/08/2015 4/02/2015 Favorable with Amendments {773196/1 Report Adopted 63
House 4/08/2015 4/02/2015 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 63
House 4/09/2015 4/03/2015 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (139-0) 64
Senate 4/10/2015 4/03/2015 Senate Concur - House Amendments 61
Senate 4/10/2015 4/03/2015 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 61
Senate 4/10/2015 4/03/2015 Passed Enrolled 61
Post Passage 5/12/2015 5/12/2015 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 207
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   13-601, 13-612, 13-612.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM