Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Automobile Insurance Fund - Operations
Sponsored by
Senator Middleton
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 509
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Repealing a provision of law subjecting the Maryland Automobile Insurance Fund to the imposition of a specified premium tax; altering the scope of provisions of law governing prior approval rate making to exclude the Fund; providing that provisions of law governing competitive rating rate making apply to the Fund under specified circumstances; repealing a provision of law that makes the Fund subject to the provisions of the Open Meetings Act; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1541
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2017, January 1, 2018
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2017
Legislative Date
2/03/2017
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2017
Legislative Date
2/07/2017
Action
Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Maryland Automobile Insurance Fund - Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2017
Legislative Date
3/17/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2017
Legislative Date
3/17/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {797376/1 Adopted
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2017
Legislative Date
3/17/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Maryland Automobile Insurance Fund - Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2017
Legislative Date
3/18/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2017
Legislative Date
3/18/2017
Action
Referred Economic Matters
Proceedings
52 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2017
Legislative Date
3/21/2017
Action
Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2017
Legislative Date
4/05/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2017
Legislative Date
3/29/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
63 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2017
Legislative Date
3/30/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (139-0)
Proceedings
64 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2017
Legislative Date
4/01/2017
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
61 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/04/2017
Legislative Date
5/04/2017
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 509
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Maryland Automobile Insurance Fund - Operations
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/03/2017 2/03/2017 First Reading Finance
Senate 2/07/2017 2/07/2017 Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Maryland Automobile Insurance Fund - Operations
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/17/2017 3/17/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 3/17/2017 3/17/2017 Favorable with Amendments {797376/1 Adopted 46 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/17/2017 3/17/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 46 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Maryland Automobile Insurance Fund - Operations
Senate 3/20/2017 3/18/2017 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 47 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/21/2017 3/18/2017 Referred Economic Matters 52 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/21/2017 3/21/2017 Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/05/2017 4/05/2017 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 4/05/2017 3/29/2017 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 63 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/06/2017 3/30/2017 Third Reading Passed (139-0) 64 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/07/2017 4/01/2017 Returned Passed 61 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/04/2017 5/04/2017 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 509
Text - Chapter - Maryland Automobile Insurance Fund - Operations
(   11-303, 20-201, 20-304, 20-502, 20-507, 20-509, 20-513, 20-514, 6-101 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:35 PM
Click to return on the top page