Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Comptroller - Special Event Liquor Permit
Sponsored by
Senator Hershey
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing the Office of the Comptroller to issue a special event liquor permit to a holder of a Class 2 manufacturer's license for specified purposes under specified circumstances; establishing limitations on the number and locations of special event liquor permits that may be issued in a year; establishing requirements and a $25 fee per event for the special event liquor permit; authorizing the holder of the special event liquor permit to provide samples of and sell specified liquor under specified circumstances; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2015
Legislative Date
3/09/2015
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2015
Legislative Date
3/16/2015
Action
Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2015
Legislative Date
3/17/2015
Action
Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 3/06/2015 3/09/2015 First Reading Senate Rules
Senate 3/13/2015 3/16/2015 Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/17/2015 3/17/2015 Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   12-107, 2-101, 2-203 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM