Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Insurance - Bail Bondsmen - Installment Agreements and Premium Rates
Sponsored by
Senator Feldman
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing a minimum 35% required down payment in connection with specified bail bond installment agreements; requiring the execution of a promissory note and an installment agreement for the remaining balance; providing a maximum term of 15 months for the installment agreements; requiring a specified bail bondsman to file a civil action for specified relief under specified circumstances; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/08/2016
Legislative Date
2/05/2016
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2016
Legislative Date
2/10/2016
Action
Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2016
Legislative Date
3/21/2016
Action
Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/08/2016 2/05/2016 First Reading Finance
Senate 2/10/2016 2/10/2016 Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/19/2016 3/21/2016 Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-309, 10-310, 21-104 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM