Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Veteran Suicide Prevention - Comprehensive Action Plan
Sponsored by
Senators Waugh, Astle, Bates, Benson, Brochin, Cassilly, Conway, Currie, DeGrange, Eckardt, Edwards, Feldman, Ferguson, Guzzone, Hershey, Hough, Jennings, Kagan, Kasemeyer, Kelley, King, Klausmeier, Lee, Madaleno, Manno, Mathias, McFadden, Middleton, Miller, Muse, Nathan-Pulliam, Norman, Peters, Pinsky, Ramirez, Ready, Reilly, Robinson, Rosapepe, Salling, Serafini, Simonaire, Smith, Young, Zirkin, and Zucker
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Department of Veterans Affairs to develop a certain action plan to increase access to and the availability of professional veteran health services to prevent veteran suicides; requiring the plan to address certain matters; requiring the Department to collaborate with interested parties in developing the plan; requiring the Department to implement certain initiatives and reforms by June 30, 2022, and June 30, 2028; terminating the Act after June 30, 2028; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2018
Legislative Date
2/05/2018
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2018
Legislative Date
2/07/2018
Action
Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Veteran Suicide Prevention - Comprehensive Action Plan
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/08/2018
Legislative Date
3/08/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/08/2018
Legislative Date
3/08/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
42
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/08/2018
Legislative Date
3/08/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
42
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Veteran Suicide Prevention - Comprehensive Action Plan
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2018
Legislative Date
3/12/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
44
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2018
Legislative Date
3/10/2018
Action
Referred Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
44
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2018
Legislative Date
3/21/2018
Action
Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/05/2018 2/05/2018 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/07/2018 2/07/2018 Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Veteran Suicide Prevention - Comprehensive Action Plan
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/08/2018 3/08/2018 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/08/2018 3/08/2018 Favorable Adopted 42
Senate 3/08/2018 3/08/2018 Second Reading Passed 42
Text - Third - Veteran Suicide Prevention - Comprehensive Action Plan
Senate 3/12/2018 3/12/2018 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 44
House 3/13/2018 3/10/2018 Referred Health and Government Operations 44
House 3/21/2018 3/21/2018 Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:36 PM