Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Gender Diversity in the Boardroom – Annual Report
Sponsored by
Senators Beidle, Carter, Elfreth, Kagan, Lee, Klausmeier, Washington, and Ferguson
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 514
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing the intent of the General Assembly to promote gender diversity in corporate management and boardrooms; requiring a certain entity submitting an annual report to the State Department of Assessments and Taxation to include information relating to the number of female members of the board and the total number of members of the board; providing the Act does not apply to a privately held company if at least 75% of the company's shareholders are family members; etc.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Opposite:
Ways and Means  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1116
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/14/2019
Legislative Date
2/14/2019
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/21/2019
Legislative Date
2/22/2019
Action
Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/22/2019
Legislative Date
2/22/2019
Action
Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2019
Legislative Date
3/15/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2019
Legislative Date
3/15/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {579737/1
Proceedings
47A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2019
Legislative Date
3/15/2019
Action
Motion Laid Over (Senator Jennings) Adopted
Proceedings
47A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2019
Legislative Date
3/17/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {579737/1
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2019
Legislative Date
3/17/2019
Action
Motion Special Order until 3/20 (Senator Elfreth) Adopted
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2019
Legislative Date
3/18/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {579737/1 Adopted
Proceedings
50
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2019
Legislative Date
3/18/2019
Action
Floor Amendment {973521/3 (Senator Elfreth) Adopted
Proceedings
50
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2019
Legislative Date
3/18/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
50
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Gender Diversity in the Boardroom – Annual Report
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2019
Legislative Date
3/19/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (40-6)
Proceedings
51
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/22/2019
Legislative Date
3/17/2019
Action
Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
52
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/26/2019
Legislative Date
3/27/2019
Action
Rereferred to Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2019
Legislative Date
3/27/2019
Action
Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2019
Legislative Date
4/03/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2019
Legislative Date
3/24/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {185765/1 Adopted
Proceedings
59
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2019
Legislative Date
3/24/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
59
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2019
Legislative Date
3/25/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (106-32)
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/30/2019
Action
Senate Concurs House Amendments
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/30/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (40-6)
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/30/2019
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Enrolled - Gender Diversity in the Boardroom – Annual Report
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/13/2019
Legislative Date
5/13/2019
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 514
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Gender Diversity in the Boardroom – Annual Report
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/14/2019 2/14/2019 First Reading Senate Rules
Text - First - Gender Diversity in the Boardroom - Annual Report or Nonprofit Sales and Use Tax Exemption Application
Senate 2/21/2019 2/22/2019 Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/22/2019 2/22/2019 Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/15/2019 3/15/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/18/2019 3/15/2019 Favorable with Amendments {579737/1 47A
Senate 3/18/2019 3/15/2019 Motion Laid Over (Senator Jennings) Adopted 47A
Senate 3/19/2019 3/17/2019 Favorable with Amendments {579737/1 49
Senate 3/19/2019 3/17/2019 Motion Special Order until 3/20 (Senator Elfreth) Adopted 49
Senate 3/20/2019 3/18/2019 Favorable with Amendments {579737/1 Adopted 50
Senate 3/20/2019 3/18/2019 Floor Amendment {973521/3 (Senator Elfreth) Adopted 50
Senate 3/20/2019 3/18/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 50
Text - Third - Gender Diversity in the Boardroom – Annual Report
Senate 3/21/2019 3/19/2019 Third Reading Passed (40-6) 51
House 3/22/2019 3/17/2019 Referred Rules and Executive Nominations 52
House 3/26/2019 3/27/2019 Rereferred to Ways and Means
House 3/27/2019 3/27/2019 Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
House 4/03/2019 4/03/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 4/03/2019 3/24/2019 Favorable with Amendments {185765/1 Adopted 59
House 4/03/2019 3/24/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 59
House 4/03/2019 3/25/2019 Third Reading Passed (106-32) 60
Senate 4/05/2019 3/30/2019 Senate Concurs House Amendments 62
Senate 4/05/2019 3/30/2019 Third Reading Passed (40-6) 62
Senate 4/05/2019 3/30/2019 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Gender Diversity in the Boardroom – Annual Report
Post Passage 5/13/2019 5/13/2019 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 514
Text - Chapter - Gender Diversity in the Boardroom – Annual Report
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   11-101 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:35 PM