Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Animal Abuse Registry
Sponsored by
Senator Stone
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Department of Public Safety and Correctional Services to establish the Maryland Animal Abuse Registry; requiring the Registry to be updated in a specified manner and to include specified information; requiring a person convicted of specified crimes involving animal cruelty to register with the county sheriff for a specified period in a specified manner; requiring a registrant to update specified information for registration; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0301 Session: 2012 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2014
Legislative Date
1/31/2014
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2014
Legislative Date
2/05/2014
Action
Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/03/2014 1/31/2014 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/05/2014 2/05/2014 Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
Date Posted Document Name
2/04/2014 Text - First - Maryland Animal Abuse Registry
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   11-1101 through 11-1111 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM