Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Prenatal and Infant Care Coordination Services Grant Program Fund (Thrive by Three Fund)
Sponsored by
Senators Ferguson, Madaleno, Rosapepe, Young, and Zucker
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 559
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing the Maryland Prenatal and Infant Care Coordination Services Grant Program Fund to make grants to counties and municipalities to provide care coordination services to low-income pregnant and postpartum women and to children from birth to 3 years old; authorizing any county or municipality to apply for a grant; requiring that an application for a grant from the Fund include certain evidence and a certain plan; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1685
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2018
Legislative Date
2/05/2018
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2018
Legislative Date
2/07/2018
Action
Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {887172/1 Adopted
Proceedings
48
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
48
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/17/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
48C
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Referred Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
50
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2018
Legislative Date
3/28/2018
Action
Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2018
Legislative Date
4/06/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2018
Legislative Date
3/28/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {586484/1 Adopted
Proceedings
62
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2018
Legislative Date
3/28/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
62
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2018
Legislative Date
3/29/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (134-0)
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/03/2018
Action
Senate Concurs House Amendments
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/03/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/03/2018
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/08/2018
Legislative Date
5/08/2018
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 559
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/05/2018 2/05/2018 First Reading Finance
Senate 2/07/2018 2/07/2018 Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Maryland Prenatal and Infant Care Coordination Services Grant Program Fund (Thrive by Three Fund)
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 3/16/2018 3/16/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 3/16/2018 3/16/2018 Favorable with Amendments {887172/1 Adopted 48
Senate 3/16/2018 3/16/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 48
Text - Third - Maryland Prenatal and Infant Care Coordination Services Grant Program Fund (Thrive by Three Fund)
Senate 3/19/2018 3/17/2018 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 48C
House 3/20/2018 3/16/2018 Referred Health and Government Operations 50
House 3/28/2018 3/28/2018 Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
House 4/06/2018 4/06/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 4/06/2018 3/28/2018 Favorable with Amendments {586484/1 Adopted 62
House 4/06/2018 3/28/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 62
House 4/06/2018 3/29/2018 Third Reading Passed (134-0) 63
Senate 4/09/2018 4/03/2018 Senate Concurs House Amendments 65
Senate 4/09/2018 4/03/2018 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 65
Senate 4/09/2018 4/03/2018 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Maryland Prenatal and Infant Care Coordination Services Grant Program Fund (Thrive by Three Fund)
Post Passage 5/08/2018 5/08/2018 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 559
Text - Chapter - Maryland Prenatal and Infant Care Coordination Services Grant Program Fund (Thrive by Three Fund)
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   24-1501 through 24-1505 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:36 PM