Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Healthy Working Families Act - Adverse Actions - Absence Control Policy
Sponsored by
Senator Beidle
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting a certain provision of the Maryland Healthy Working Families Act from being construed to prohibit an employer from applying a certain absence control policy if the employer provides at least 40 hours of paid leave a year, excluding earned sick and safe leave, and the absence control policy is uniformly applied, is provided to all employees in writing, has a progressive accountability structure, and provides for a warning before any possible action is taken against an employee.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0686
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/14/2019
Legislative Date
2/14/2019
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/21/2019
Legislative Date
2/22/2019
Action
Rereferred to Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/04/2019
Legislative Date
3/04/2019
Action
Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/14/2019 2/14/2019 First Reading Senate Rules
Text - First - Maryland Healthy Working Families Act - Adverse Actions - Absence Control Policy
Senate 2/21/2019 2/22/2019 Rereferred to Finance
Senate 3/04/2019 3/04/2019 Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:35 PM