Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Ethics Law - Financial Disclosure Statement by Elected Local Official of Municipal Corporation - Confidential Information
Sponsored by
Senators Raskin, Brinkley, Feldman, Forehand, Getty, King, Madaleno, Peters, Rosapepe, and Shank
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering financial disclosure provisions governing elected local officials of a municipal corporation; prohibiting the disclosure of specified information concerning specified relatives that is included in the financial disclosure statement filed by an elected local official of a municipal corporation; providing exceptions; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1369
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2014
Legislative Date
1/31/2014
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2014
Legislative Date
2/05/2014
Action
Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/03/2014 1/31/2014 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/05/2014 2/05/2014 Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   5-804, 5-809 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM