Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Prevailing Wage Law - Payroll Reporting Requirements
Sponsored by
Senator McFadden
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Analysis
Synopsis
Applying specified payroll reporting requirements under the prevailing wage law to specified contractors under specified public work contracts with a value of at least $100,000; and providing that specified contractors under specified public work contracts with a value of less than $500,000 are not required to comply with specified payroll reporting requirements under the prevailing wage law.
Committees
Original:
Finance
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0792
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/08/2016
Legislative Date
2/05/2016
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/15/2016
Legislative Date
2/15/2016
Action
Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/08/2016 2/05/2016 First Reading Finance
Senate 2/15/2016 2/15/2016 Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM