Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Retirement Agency - Investment Division Personnel
Sponsored by
Senator Guzzone
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing the Board of Trustees for the State Retirement and Pension System to determine the qualifications and compensation of specified positions in the Investment Division in the State Retirement Agency; authorizing the Board of Trustees to create specified positions in the Investment Division; requiring specified positions to be funded from specified existing funds; requiring the Board of Trustees to report specified information to specified General Assembly committees on or before October 1 annually; etc.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1580
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2017
Legislative Date
2/03/2017
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - State Retirement Agency - Investment Division Personnel
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/08/2017
Legislative Date
2/08/2017
Action
Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/13/2017
Legislative Date
2/13/2017
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/13/2017
Legislative Date
2/13/2017
Action
Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/03/2017 2/03/2017 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Text - First - State Retirement Agency - Investment Division Personnel
Senate 2/08/2017 2/08/2017 Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/13/2017 2/13/2017 Hearing canceled
Senate 2/13/2017 2/13/2017 Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:35 PM