Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Health - Emergency Use Auto-Injectable Epinephrine Program
Sponsored by
Senator Manno
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing the Emergency Use Auto-Injectable Epinephrine Program in the Department of Health and Mental Hygiene; providing for the purpose of the Program; authorizing the Department to adopt specified regulations, collect specified fees, issue and renew specified certificates, and conduct and approve specified training programs relating to the Program; establishing qualifications for applicants for a certificate; requiring the Department to issue specified certificates to specified applicants; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1333
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2014
Legislative Date
1/31/2014
Action
First Reading Finance and Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2014
Legislative Date
2/05/2014
Action
Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/03/2014 1/31/2014 First Reading Finance and Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/05/2014 2/05/2014 Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance)
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   13-7A-01 through 13-7A-10 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM