Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Personnel - Selection Test Credits - Eligible Volunteer Fire, Rescue, or Emergency Medical Services Providers
Sponsored by
Senators Jennings, DeGrange, Manno, Middleton, Montgomery, Astle, Kelley, Feldman, Benson, Reilly, Pugh, Mathias, and Hershey
Status
In the House - Hearing 4/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring specified appointing authorities to apply a specified credit on any selection test for specified positions in the State Personnel Management System for specified eligible volunteer fire, rescue, or emergency medical services providers; requiring that an appointing authority apply a credit of ten points on any selection test for the surviving spouses of deceased eligible volunteer fire, rescue, or emergency medical services providers who died in the line of duty; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Opposite:
Appropriations  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/09/2015
Legislative Date
3/09/2015
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2015
Legislative Date
3/18/2015
Action
Rereferred to Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2015
Legislative Date
3/17/2015
Action
Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/23/2015
Legislative Date
3/23/2015
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/23/2015
Legislative Date
3/23/2015
Action
Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2015
Legislative Date
4/01/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2015
Legislative Date
3/27/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {187979/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
54
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2015
Legislative Date
3/27/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
54
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2015
Legislative Date
3/28/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
55
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2015
Legislative Date
3/29/2015
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
59
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2015
Legislative Date
4/09/2015
Action
Rereferred to Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2015
Legislative Date
4/09/2015
Action
Hearing 4/09 at 3:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2015
Legislative Date
4/09/2015
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2015
Legislative Date
4/09/2015
Action
Hearing 4/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 3/09/2015 3/09/2015 First Reading Senate Rules
Senate 3/17/2015 3/18/2015 Rereferred to Finance
Senate 3/17/2015 3/17/2015 Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/23/2015 3/23/2015 Hearing cancelled
Senate 3/23/2015 3/23/2015 Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/31/2015 4/01/2015 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 4/01/2015 3/27/2015 Favorable with Amendments {187979/1 Report Adopted 54
Senate 4/01/2015 3/27/2015 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 54
Senate 4/02/2015 3/28/2015 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 55
House 4/02/2015 3/29/2015 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations 59
House 4/09/2015 4/09/2015 Rereferred to Appropriations
House 4/09/2015 4/09/2015 Hearing 4/09 at 3:00 p.m.
House 4/09/2015 4/09/2015 Hearing cancelled
House 4/09/2015 4/09/2015 Hearing 4/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM