Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Motor Vehicle Liability Insurance - Advance of Medical Expenses
Sponsored by
Senator Jennings (By Request)
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Providing that an insurer that issues, sells, or delivers a policy of motor vehicle liability insurance in the State must pay a specified benefit to an individual who is injured in a collision with a motor vehicle for anticipated medical expenses under specified circumstances; providing that the benefit may not be waived; establishing that the benefit is an advance for anticipated medical expenses for specified injuries; requiring the policy to contain a specified maximum benefit; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/08/2016
Legislative Date
2/05/2016
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2016
Legislative Date
2/10/2016
Action
Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/07/2016
Legislative Date
3/07/2016
Action
Unfavorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/08/2016 2/05/2016 First Reading Finance
Senate 2/10/2016 2/10/2016 Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/07/2016 3/07/2016 Unfavorable Report by Finance
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   19-507, 19-513, 19-518 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM