Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Law Enforcement Communications Technology Procurement Task Force
Sponsored by
Senator Pugh
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/24 at 1:30 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing the Maryland Law Enforcement Communications Technology Procurement Task Force; providing for the composition, chair, and staffing of the Task Force; requiring the Task Force to study and make recommendations about any changes that may be made to the procurement process for law enforcement communications technology that may lead to cost savings for the State; requiring the Task Force to report its findings to specified committees of the General Assembly on or before December 31, 2015; etc.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1246
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2015
Creates a Task Force or Commission
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/09/2015
Legislative Date
3/09/2015
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2015
Legislative Date
3/16/2015
Action
Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2015
Legislative Date
3/18/2015
Action
Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2015
Legislative Date
3/20/2015
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2015
Legislative Date
3/20/2015
Action
Hearing 3/24 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 3/09/2015 3/09/2015 First Reading Senate Rules
Senate 3/13/2015 3/16/2015 Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/18/2015 3/18/2015 Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/20/2015 3/20/2015 Hearing cancelled
Senate 3/20/2015 3/20/2015 Hearing 3/24 at 1:30 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM