Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Harford County - Alcoholic Beverages - Community College License
Sponsored by
Harford County Senators
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 448
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing a Class CC (community college) beer and wine license in Harford County; authorizing the Board of License Commissioners to issue the license to officers of a community college for use on specified parts of the community college campus; providing that the license authorizes the sale of beer and wine for on-premises consumption to specified individuals; limiting the number of days the license holder may sell beer and wine at specified events to a maximum of 25 days per year; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/08/2016
Legislative Date
2/05/2016
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2016
Legislative Date
2/10/2016
Action
Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/09/2016
Legislative Date
3/10/2016
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2016
Legislative Date
3/11/2016
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
42
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2016
Legislative Date
3/11/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
42
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2016
Legislative Date
3/15/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
44
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2016
Legislative Date
3/19/2016
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
51
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2016
Legislative Date
4/04/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2016
Legislative Date
3/28/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {763594/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
60
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2016
Legislative Date
3/28/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
60
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2016
Legislative Date
4/01/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (135-2)
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2016
Legislative Date
4/03/2016
Action
Senate Concur - House Amendments
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2016
Legislative Date
4/03/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2016
Legislative Date
4/03/2016
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/10/2016
Legislative Date
5/10/2016
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 448
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/08/2016 2/05/2016 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/10/2016 2/10/2016 Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/09/2016 3/10/2016 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/11/2016 3/11/2016 Favorable Report Adopted 42
Senate 3/11/2016 3/11/2016 Second Reading Passed 42
Senate 3/15/2016 3/15/2016 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 44
House 3/21/2016 3/19/2016 First Reading Economic Matters 51
House 4/04/2016 4/04/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 4/04/2016 3/28/2016 Favorable with Amendments {763594/1 Report Adopted 60
House 4/04/2016 3/28/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 60
House 4/07/2016 4/01/2016 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (135-2) 64
Senate 4/09/2016 4/03/2016 Senate Concur - House Amendments 63
Senate 4/09/2016 4/03/2016 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 63
Senate 4/09/2016 4/03/2016 Passed Enrolled 63
Post Passage 5/10/2016 5/10/2016 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 448
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   22-102, 22-807.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM