Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Physicians – Dispensing Permit Exemption – Topical Medication
Sponsored by
Senator Lam
Status
Veto sustained (0-46)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Providing that certain provisions of law do not prohibit a certain licensed physician from dispensing a topical medication; authorizing a physician to dispense a certain topical medication if the physician meets certain requirements; authorizing the State Board of Physicians to issue a written permit to certain physicians under certain circumstances; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1288
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/14/2019
Legislative Date
2/14/2019
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Physicians - Dispensing Permit Exemption - Prepackaged Topical
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/21/2019
Legislative Date
2/22/2019
Action
Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/26/2019
Legislative Date
2/26/2019
Action
Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2019
Legislative Date
4/02/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2019
Legislative Date
3/27/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {134736/1 Adopted
Proceedings
59A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2019
Legislative Date
3/27/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
59A
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Physicians – Dispensing Permit Exemption – Topical Medication
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2019
Legislative Date
3/28/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (44-0)
Proceedings
60
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2019
Legislative Date
3/25/2019
Action
Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
60
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2019
Legislative Date
4/04/2019
Action
Rereferred to Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2019
Legislative Date
4/04/2019
Action
Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
4/05/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/29/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2019
Legislative Date
3/30/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
3/31/2019
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/24/2019
Legislative Date
5/24/2019
Action
Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Governor's Veto Letter
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/09/2020
Legislative Date
1/09/2020
Action
Veto sustained (0-46)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/14/2019 2/14/2019 First Reading Senate Rules
Text - First - Physicians - Dispensing Permit Exemption - Prepackaged Topical
Senate 2/21/2019 2/22/2019 Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/26/2019 2/26/2019 Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/02/2019 4/02/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/02/2019 3/27/2019 Favorable with Amendments {134736/1 Adopted 59A
Senate 4/02/2019 3/27/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 59A
Text - Third - Physicians – Dispensing Permit Exemption – Topical Medication
Senate 4/03/2019 3/28/2019 Third Reading Passed (44-0) 60
House 4/03/2019 3/25/2019 Referred Rules and Executive Nominations 60
House 4/04/2019 4/04/2019 Rereferred to Health and Government Operations
House 4/04/2019 4/04/2019 Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
House 4/05/2019 4/05/2019 Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
House 4/05/2019 3/29/2019 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 64
House 4/06/2019 3/30/2019 Third Reading Passed (137-0) 65
Senate 4/08/2019 3/31/2019 Returned Passed 63
Post Passage 5/24/2019 5/24/2019 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Governor's Veto Letter
Senate 1/09/2020 1/09/2020 Veto sustained (0-46)
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   12-102, 14-509 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:35 PM