Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Department of Assessments and Taxation - Assessments, Audits, Records, and Appeals (SDAT Reform Act of 2019)
Sponsored by
Senator Lam
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the State Department of Assessments and Taxation to hold certain public education sessions; requiring the Department to adopt regulations to establish a procedure by which a person may request certain corrections to certain records maintained by the Department; requiring the Department to publish on the Department's website the methodology by which the Department classifies certain property; requiring the Department to establish certain audit procedures and regulations to implement those procedures; etc.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1088
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/14/2019
Legislative Date
2/14/2019
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/21/2019
Legislative Date
2/22/2019
Action
Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/22/2019
Legislative Date
2/22/2019
Action
Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/14/2019 2/14/2019 First Reading Senate Rules
Text - First - State Department of Assessments and Taxation - Assessments, Audits, Records, and Appeals (SDAT Reform Act of 2019)
Senate 2/21/2019 2/22/2019 Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/22/2019 2/22/2019 Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   1-402, 14-201, 14-502, 14-509, 14-510.1, 14-511, 2-202, 2-211, 2-218.1, 2-218.2, 8-401 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:35 PM