Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Environment - Implementation of Watershed Implementation Plan - Limitation
Sponsored by
Senator Hershey
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting a person from engaging in an activity or a strategy to implement a State Watershed Implementation Plan until the U.S. Environmental Protection Agency completes and publishes the 2017 Chesapeake Bay midpoint assessment and the University of Maryland Center for Environmental Science completes the 2-year study begun in 2015 to quantify and analyze the sediment and associated nutrients in major entry points to the Lower Susquehanna River Reservoir System and the upper Chesapeake Bay and other specified assessments; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1268
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0695 Session: 2012 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2015
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/09/2015
Legislative Date
3/09/2015
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2015
Legislative Date
3/16/2015
Action
Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2015
Legislative Date
3/17/2015
Action
Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/26/2015
Legislative Date
3/27/2015
Action
Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 3/09/2015 3/09/2015 First Reading Senate Rules
Senate 3/13/2015 3/16/2015 Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/17/2015 3/17/2015 Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/26/2015 3/27/2015 Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
(   4-801, 4-802 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM
Click to return on the top page