Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Insurance - Self-Funded Student Health Plans
Sponsored by
Senators Middleton, Astle, Benson, Feldman, Hershey, Jennings, Kelley, Klausmeier, Mathias, Pugh, and Reilly
Status
Veto sustained (0-46)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Exempting from specified State insurance laws a self-funded student health plan operated by an independent institution of higher education that provides health care services to its students and their dependents if the institution files a specified report on July 1 each year; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Details
Emergency Bill
Cross-filed with: HB1247
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): Upon Enactment
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/01/0001
Legislative Date
1/18/2017
Action
Veto sustained (0-46)
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/08/2016
Legislative Date
2/05/2016
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2016
Legislative Date
2/10/2016
Action
Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/22/2016
Legislative Date
2/22/2016
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/22/2016
Legislative Date
2/22/2016
Action
Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2016
Legislative Date
3/16/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2016
Legislative Date
3/17/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {837676/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
46
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2016
Legislative Date
3/17/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
46
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2016
Legislative Date
3/18/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
47
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2016
Legislative Date
3/18/2016
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
50
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/23/2016
Legislative Date
3/23/2016
Action
Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2016
Legislative Date
4/01/2016
Action
Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2016
Legislative Date
3/27/2016
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
59
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2016
Legislative Date
3/27/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
59
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2016
Legislative Date
3/28/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (136-0)
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2016
Legislative Date
3/29/2016
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
58
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/31/2016
Legislative Date
5/27/2016
Action
Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/01/0001 1/18/2017 Veto sustained (0-46)
Senate 2/08/2016 2/05/2016 First Reading Finance
Senate 2/10/2016 2/10/2016 Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/22/2016 2/22/2016 Hearing cancelled
Senate 2/22/2016 2/22/2016 Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/15/2016 3/16/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 3/17/2016 3/17/2016 Favorable with Amendments {837676/1 Report Adopted 46
Senate 3/17/2016 3/17/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 46
Senate 3/18/2016 3/18/2016 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 47
House 3/21/2016 3/18/2016 First Reading Health and Government Operations 50
House 3/23/2016 3/23/2016 Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/31/2016 4/01/2016 Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
House 4/01/2016 3/27/2016 Favorable Report Adopted 59
House 4/01/2016 3/27/2016 Second Reading Passed 59
House 4/04/2016 3/28/2016 Third Reading Passed (136-0) 60
Senate 4/04/2016 3/29/2016 Returned Passed 58
Post Passage 5/31/2016 5/27/2016 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   1-202, 15-10A-01, 15-10D-01 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM