Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Criminal Procedure - Pretrial Release
Sponsored by
Senator Miller
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Repealing the authority of a District Court commissioner to set bond or commit persons to jail in default of bond; authorizing a District Court commissioner to release a defendant charged with a felony from pretrial detention under specified circumstances; requiring a District Court commissioner to release a defendant charged with a misdemeanor on personal recognizance under specified circumstances; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2014
Legislative Date
1/31/2014
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2014
Legislative Date
2/05/2014
Action
Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/03/2014 1/31/2014 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/05/2014 2/05/2014 Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
Date Posted Document Name
2/04/2014 Text - First - Criminal Procedure - Pretrial Release
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   4-101, 5-202, 5-202.1, 5-202.2, 5-202.3 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM