Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Human Services - Homelessness - Emergency Cold Weather Planning
Sponsored by
Senator Pugh
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing an emergency cold weather council in each county; establishing the membership of emergency cold weather councils; requiring emergency cold weather councils to create specified plans; requiring local administering agencies to provide a specified plan to the Department of Human Resources on or before October 1 each year; requiring local administering agencies to initiate specified plans under specified conditions; requiring specified agencies to collaborate to create a specified reporting system; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1482
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/08/2016
Legislative Date
2/05/2016
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/12/2016
Legislative Date
2/12/2016
Action
Reassigned to Finance
Proceedings
22
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/17/2016
Legislative Date
2/17/2016
Action
Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/08/2016 2/05/2016 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/12/2016 2/12/2016 Reassigned to Finance 22
Senate 2/17/2016 2/17/2016 Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   6-441 through 6-447 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM