Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
**Veto override
   SB0921 - 2016RS
   CH0002 - 2017RS
Title
Clean Energy Jobs - Renewable Energy Portfolio Standard Revisions
Sponsored by
Senators Pugh, Feldman, Benson, Madaleno, Mathias, Middleton, Pinsky, Raskin, and Muse
Status
Became law per Maryland Constitution, Chapter 2 of 2017
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering the renewable energy portfolio standard percentage derived from solar energy for specified years; altering the renewable energy portfolio standard percentage derived from Tier 1 renewable sources for specified years; authorizing the Small, Minority, and Women-Owned Businesses Account to receive money from the Strategic Energy Investment Fund; requiring the Department of Labor, Licensing, and Regulation to study the workforce development training needs for the clean energy industry in the State; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Opposite:
Economic Matters
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1106
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/08/2016
Legislative Date
2/05/2016
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2016
Legislative Date
2/10/2016
Action
Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2016
Legislative Date
4/01/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2016
Legislative Date
3/28/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {457976/1
Proceedings
57
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2016
Legislative Date
3/28/2016
Action
Laid Over (Senator Middleton) Adopted
Proceedings
57
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2016
Legislative Date
3/29/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {457976/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
58
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2016
Legislative Date
3/29/2016
Action
Floor Amendment (Senator Middleton) {413320/1 Adopted
Proceedings
58
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2016
Legislative Date
3/29/2016
Action
Special Order until 4/5 (Senator Hershey) Adopted
Proceedings
58
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2016
Legislative Date
3/30/2016
Action
Special Order until later today (Senator Hershey) Adopted
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2016
Legislative Date
3/30/2016
Action
Floor Amendment (Senator Serafini) {813023/1 Rejected (14-31)
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2016
Legislative Date
3/30/2016
Action
Floor Amendment (Senator Ready) {663129/1 Rejected (15-31)
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2016
Legislative Date
3/30/2016
Action
Floor Amendment (Senator Hough) {503023/1 Rejected (22-22)
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2016
Legislative Date
3/30/2016
Action
Floor Amendment (Senator Muse) {393723/1 Adopted
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2016
Legislative Date
3/30/2016
Action
Floor Amendment (Senator Hershey) {133822/1 Adopted
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2016
Legislative Date
3/30/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2016
Legislative Date
3/31/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (31-14)
Proceedings
60
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2016
Legislative Date
3/31/2016
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
63
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2016
Legislative Date
4/07/2016
Action
Rereferred to Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2016
Legislative Date
4/09/2016
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2016
Legislative Date
4/04/2016
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
67
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2016
Legislative Date
4/04/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
67
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/05/2016
Action
Special Order until next session (Delegate McConkey) Adopted
Proceedings
68
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/07/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (91-48)
Proceedings
70
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/12/2016
Legislative Date
4/08/2016
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
68
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/31/2016
Legislative Date
5/27/2016
Action
Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/02/2017
Legislative Date
2/02/2017
Action
Veto overridden (32-13)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2017
Legislative Date
2/07/2017
Action
Veto overridden (88-51)
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
2/07/2017
Legislative Date
2/07/2017
Action
Became law per Maryland Constitution, Chapter 2 of 2017
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/08/2016 2/05/2016 First Reading Finance
Senate 2/10/2016 2/10/2016 Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/31/2016 4/01/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 4/01/2016 3/28/2016 Favorable with Amendments {457976/1 57
Senate 4/01/2016 3/28/2016 Laid Over (Senator Middleton) Adopted 57
Senate 4/04/2016 3/29/2016 Favorable with Amendments {457976/1 Report Adopted 58
Senate 4/04/2016 3/29/2016 Floor Amendment (Senator Middleton) {413320/1 Adopted 58
Senate 4/04/2016 3/29/2016 Special Order until 4/5 (Senator Hershey) Adopted 58
Senate 4/05/2016 3/30/2016 Special Order until later today (Senator Hershey) Adopted 59
Senate 4/05/2016 3/30/2016 Floor Amendment (Senator Serafini) {813023/1 Rejected (14-31) 59
Senate 4/05/2016 3/30/2016 Floor Amendment (Senator Ready) {663129/1 Rejected (15-31) 59
Senate 4/05/2016 3/30/2016 Floor Amendment (Senator Hough) {503023/1 Rejected (22-22) 59
Senate 4/05/2016 3/30/2016 Floor Amendment (Senator Muse) {393723/1 Adopted 59
Senate 4/05/2016 3/30/2016 Floor Amendment (Senator Hershey) {133822/1 Adopted 59
Senate 4/05/2016 3/30/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 59
Senate 4/06/2016 3/31/2016 Third Reading Passed (31-14) 60
House 4/07/2016 3/31/2016 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations 63
House 4/07/2016 4/07/2016 Rereferred to Economic Matters
House 4/09/2016 4/09/2016 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 4/09/2016 4/04/2016 Favorable Report Adopted 67
House 4/09/2016 4/04/2016 Second Reading Passed 67
House 4/11/2016 4/05/2016 Special Order until next session (Delegate McConkey) Adopted 68
House 4/11/2016 4/07/2016 Third Reading Passed (91-48) 70
Senate 4/12/2016 4/08/2016 Returned Passed 68
Post Passage 5/31/2016 5/27/2016 Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Senate 2/02/2017 2/02/2017 Veto overridden (32-13)
House 2/07/2017 2/07/2017 Veto overridden (88-51)
Post Passage 2/07/2017 2/07/2017 Became law per Maryland Constitution, Chapter 2 of 2017
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   7-702, 7-703, 7-705 )
(   9-1A-35, 9-20B-01, 9-20B-05 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM