Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Frederick County - Ethics and Campaign Activity - County Board and Commission Members and Board of License Commissioners
Sponsored by
Senator Hough
Status
In the House - Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Prohibiting an appointed member of the Frederick County Board of Zoning Appeals, the Frederick County Ethics Commission, the Frederick County Planning Commission, or the Board of License Commissioners of Frederick County or a person acting on behalf of the member, a campaign finance entity of the member, or any other campaign finance entity operated in coordination with the member from soliciting, receiving, depositing, or using a contribution while the member is serving on the Board; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0673
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/14/2019
Legislative Date
2/14/2019
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/21/2019
Legislative Date
2/22/2019
Action
Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/07/2019
Legislative Date
3/07/2019
Action
Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/25/2019
Legislative Date
3/25/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/26/2019
Legislative Date
3/22/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {994231/1 Adopted
Proceedings
54
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/26/2019
Legislative Date
3/22/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
54
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/27/2019
Legislative Date
3/23/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
55
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2019
Legislative Date
3/20/2019
Action
Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
55
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2019
Legislative Date
3/29/2019
Action
Rereferred to Ways and Means and Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2019
Legislative Date
3/29/2019
Action
Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2019
Legislative Date
4/01/2019
Action
Hearing canceled (Ways and Means)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2019
Legislative Date
4/01/2019
Action
Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/14/2019 2/14/2019 First Reading Senate Rules
Text - First - Frederick County - Ethics and Campaign Activity - County Board and Commission Members and Board of License Commissioners
Senate 2/21/2019 2/22/2019 Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/07/2019 3/07/2019 Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/25/2019 3/25/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/26/2019 3/22/2019 Favorable with Amendments {994231/1 Adopted 54
Senate 3/26/2019 3/22/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 54
Text - Third - Frederick County - Ethics and Campaign Activity - County Board and Commission Members and Board of License Commissioners
Senate 3/27/2019 3/23/2019 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 55
House 3/28/2019 3/20/2019 Referred Rules and Executive Nominations 55
House 3/28/2019 3/29/2019 Rereferred to Ways and Means and Economic Matters
House 3/29/2019 3/29/2019 Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)
House 4/01/2019 4/01/2019 Hearing canceled (Ways and Means)
House 4/01/2019 4/01/2019 Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   20-201, 20-202 )
(   5-865, 5-866 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:35 PM