Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
City of Hagerstown - Alcoholic Beverages - Outdoor Festivals and Street Festival Licenses
Sponsored by
Senator Serafini
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 210
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing the Washington County Board of License Commissioners to issue a special Class C (on-sale) beer and wine street festival license to a not-for-profit club, society, association, or organization; specifying that the license entitles the holder to exercise the privileges of the license at a specified entertainment event held in the Arts and Entertainment District and approved by the Mayor and the City Council of Hagerstown; providing a $30 per day fee for the Class C beer and wine street festival license; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1271
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/09/2015
Legislative Date
3/09/2015
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2015
Legislative Date
3/16/2015
Action
Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2015
Legislative Date
3/17/2015
Action
Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2015
Legislative Date
4/02/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2015
Legislative Date
3/28/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {904532/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
55
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2015
Legislative Date
3/28/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
55
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2015
Legislative Date
3/29/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
56
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2015
Legislative Date
3/31/2015
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
61
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2015
Legislative Date
4/08/2015
Action
Rereferred to Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2015
Legislative Date
4/08/2015
Action
Hearing 4/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2015
Legislative Date
4/09/2015
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2015
Legislative Date
4/03/2015
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2015
Legislative Date
4/03/2015
Action
Floor Committee Amendment {383898/1 Adopted
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2015
Legislative Date
4/03/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2015
Legislative Date
4/04/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (138-0)
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2015
Legislative Date
4/04/2015
Action
Senate Concur - House Amendment
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2015
Legislative Date
4/04/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2015
Legislative Date
4/04/2015
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/12/2015
Legislative Date
5/12/2015
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 210
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 3/09/2015 3/09/2015 First Reading Senate Rules
Senate 3/13/2015 3/16/2015 Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/17/2015 3/17/2015 Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 4/01/2015 4/02/2015 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/02/2015 3/28/2015 Favorable with Amendments {904532/1 Report Adopted 55
Senate 4/02/2015 3/28/2015 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 55
Senate 4/03/2015 3/29/2015 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 56
House 4/06/2015 3/31/2015 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations 61
House 4/08/2015 4/08/2015 Rereferred to Economic Matters
House 4/08/2015 4/08/2015 Hearing 4/08 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/08/2015 4/09/2015 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 4/09/2015 4/03/2015 Favorable Report Adopted 64
House 4/09/2015 4/03/2015 Floor Committee Amendment {383898/1 Adopted 64
House 4/09/2015 4/03/2015 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 64
House 4/10/2015 4/04/2015 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (138-0) 65
Senate 4/11/2015 4/04/2015 Senate Concur - House Amendment 62
Senate 4/11/2015 4/04/2015 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 62
Senate 4/11/2015 4/04/2015 Passed Enrolled 62
Post Passage 5/12/2015 5/12/2015 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 210
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   12-107, 7-101 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM