Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Career Apprenticeship Opportunity Act of 2016
Sponsored by
Senators Rosapepe, Bates, Benson, Conway, Currie, Feldman, Ferguson, Guzzone, Kagan, Kelley, Klausmeier, Madaleno, Manno, Mathias, McFadden, Muse, Nathan-Pulliam, Peters, Raskin, Salling, Simonaire, Waugh, Young, Zucker, Astle, Hershey, Middleton, Pugh, and Reilly
Status
In the House - Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the State Board of Education to develop, on or before December 1, 2016, goals for percentages of high school graduates; requiring, on or before December 1, 2016, the State Board to develop a method to consider a student's attainment of a specified credential or completion of a specified apprenticeship program as equivalent to a specified Advanced Placement examination score for a specified purpose; requiring the Division of Workforce Development to identify opportunities to create registered apprenticeship programs; etc.
Committees
Opposite:
Ways and Means
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1187
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/08/2016
Legislative Date
2/05/2016
Action
First Reading Finance and Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/17/2016
Legislative Date
2/17/2016
Action
Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance)
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2016
Legislative Date
4/07/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2016
Legislative Date
4/01/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {937577/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2016
Legislative Date
4/01/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2016
Legislative Date
4/02/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (44-0)
Proceedings
62
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2016
Legislative Date
4/02/2016
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
65
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2016
Legislative Date
4/09/2016
Action
Rereferred to Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2016
Legislative Date
4/09/2016
Action
Hearing 4/11 at 9:00 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/11/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/08/2016 2/05/2016 First Reading Finance and Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/17/2016 2/17/2016 Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance)
Senate 4/06/2016 4/07/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 4/07/2016 4/01/2016 Favorable with Amendments {937577/1 Report Adopted 61
Senate 4/07/2016 4/01/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 61
Senate 4/08/2016 4/02/2016 Third Reading Passed (44-0) 62
House 4/08/2016 4/02/2016 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations 65
House 4/09/2016 4/09/2016 Rereferred to Ways and Means
House 4/09/2016 4/09/2016 Hearing 4/11 at 9:00 a.m.
House 4/11/2016 4/11/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   21-204 )
(   11-102, 11-103 )
(   10-737 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM