Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Alcohol and Drug Abuse Program Facilities - ASAM Criteria Assessments
Sponsored by
Senator Hershey
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring a certified alcohol and drug abuse program facility to provide a patient with a copy of certain records on the patient's request; requiring the members of a patient's ASAM criteria assessment team to meet with the patient for a certain purpose; requiring a certain facility to send certain application records to a certain treatment provider within 72 hours after completing the assessment under certain circumstances; requiring a certain treatment provider provide certain referrals to certain treatment providers; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1579
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2018
Legislative Date
2/05/2018
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2018
Legislative Date
2/07/2018
Action
Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Alcohol and Drug Abuse Program Facilities - ASAM Criteria Assessments
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/09/2018
Legislative Date
2/09/2018
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/09/2018
Legislative Date
2/09/2018
Action
Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/05/2018 2/05/2018 First Reading Finance
Senate 2/07/2018 2/07/2018 Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Alcohol and Drug Abuse Program Facilities - ASAM Criteria Assessments
Senate 2/09/2018 2/09/2018 Hearing canceled
Senate 2/09/2018 2/09/2018 Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:36 PM