Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Medical Marijuana - Natalie M. LaPrade Medical Marijuana Commission
Sponsored by
Senators Raskin, Brinkley, Feldman, Forehand, Frosh, Jacobs, Madaleno, Mathias, Montgomery, Muse, Stone, Young, and Zirkin
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 256
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering the purpose of the Natalie M. LaPrade Medical Marijuana Commission to include the approval of physicians, development of a Web site, establishment of an application review process, and issuance of medical marijuana grower licenses; authorizing a medical marijuana grower to distribute marijuana at specified facilities; identifying patients and caregivers; requiring the Commission to report to the General Assembly on the level of competition in the market for medical marijuana on or before December 1, 2015; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0881
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2014
Legislative Date
1/31/2014
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2014
Legislative Date
2/05/2014
Action
Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/25/2014
Legislative Date
3/26/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/26/2014
Legislative Date
3/19/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {578876/2
Proceedings
53
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/26/2014
Legislative Date
3/19/2014
Action
Committee Amendment Adopted
Proceedings
53
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/26/2014
Legislative Date
3/19/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted
Proceedings
53
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/26/2014
Legislative Date
3/19/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
53
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/27/2014
Legislative Date
3/20/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-1)
Proceedings
54
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2014
Legislative Date
3/22/2014
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
58
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2014
Legislative Date
3/28/2014
Action
Rereferred to Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2014
Legislative Date
3/28/2014
Action
Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2014
Legislative Date
4/05/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/31/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {146385/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
67
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/31/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
67
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
4/01/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (127-9)
Proceedings
68
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/30/2014
Action
Senate Concur - House Amendments
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/30/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (44-2)
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/30/2014
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/14/2014
Legislative Date
4/14/2014
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 256
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/03/2014 1/31/2014 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/05/2014 2/05/2014 Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/25/2014 3/26/2014 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/26/2014 3/19/2014 Favorable with Amendments {578876/2 53
Senate 3/26/2014 3/19/2014 Committee Amendment Adopted 53
Senate 3/26/2014 3/19/2014 Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted 53
Senate 3/26/2014 3/19/2014 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 53
Senate 3/27/2014 3/20/2014 Third Reading Passed (45-1) 54
House 3/27/2014 3/22/2014 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations 58
House 3/28/2014 3/28/2014 Rereferred to Health and Government Operations
House 3/28/2014 3/28/2014 Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/05/2014 4/05/2014 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 4/07/2014 3/31/2014 Favorable with Amendments {146385/1 Report Adopted 67
House 4/07/2014 3/31/2014 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 67
House 4/07/2014 4/01/2014 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (127-9) 68
Senate 4/07/2014 3/30/2014 Senate Concur - House Amendments 64
Senate 4/07/2014 3/30/2014 Third Reading Passed (44-2) 64
Senate 4/07/2014 3/30/2014 Passed Enrolled 64
Post Passage 4/14/2014 4/14/2014 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 256
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   13-3301 through 13-3303, 13-3304 through 13-3306, 13-3307, 13-3307 through 13-3311, 13-3310, 13-3311, 13-3312, 13-3316 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM