Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland All-Payer Model Agreement - Medicare Skilled Nursing Facility 3-Day Rule - Waiver
Sponsored by
Senator Hershey
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring, on or before September 1, 2018, the Maryland Department of Health to request approval from the Center for Medicare and Medicaid Innovation of a waiver of the Medicare Skilled Nursing Facility 3-Day Rule and its applicability to Medicare beneficiaries in the State; requiring the request to be included in a request by the Department for updates to and an extension of the Maryland All-Payer Model Agreement submitted to the Center for Medicare and Medicaid Innovation under certain provisions of federal law; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2018
Legislative Date
2/05/2018
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2018
Legislative Date
2/07/2018
Action
Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/05/2018 2/05/2018 First Reading Finance
Senate 2/07/2018 2/07/2018 Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Maryland All-Payer Model Agreement - Medicare Skilled Nursing Facility 3-Day Rule - Waiver
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:36 PM