Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Washington County - Property Tax Credit - Economic Development Projects
Sponsored by
Washington County Senators
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 211
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Expanding a specified property tax credit for specified business entities in Washington County to include specified business entities that invest at least $10,000,000 for capital improvements of specified real property and create 100 new and permanent full-time positions in Washington County; providing for the amount and duration of the property tax credit; making conforming changes; and providing for the application of the Act to all taxable years beginning after June 30, 2015.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Opposite:
Ways and Means  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1164
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/09/2015
Legislative Date
3/09/2015
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2015
Legislative Date
3/16/2015
Action
Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2015
Legislative Date
3/18/2015
Action
Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2015
Legislative Date
3/20/2015
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2015
Legislative Date
3/20/2015
Action
Hearing 3/24 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/24/2015
Legislative Date
3/25/2015
Action
Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/26/2015
Legislative Date
3/23/2015
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
50
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/26/2015
Legislative Date
3/23/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
50
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/27/2015
Legislative Date
3/24/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
51
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2015
Legislative Date
3/25/2015
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
55
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2015
Legislative Date
4/10/2015
Action
Rereferred to Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2015
Legislative Date
4/10/2015
Action
Hearing 4/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2015
Legislative Date
4/13/2015
Action
Favorable Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/07/2015
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
68
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/07/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
68
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/08/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (136-0)
Proceedings
69
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/07/2015
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/12/2015
Legislative Date
5/12/2015
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 211
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 3/09/2015 3/09/2015 First Reading Senate Rules
Senate 3/13/2015 3/16/2015 Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/18/2015 3/18/2015 Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/20/2015 3/20/2015 Hearing cancelled
Senate 3/20/2015 3/20/2015 Hearing 3/24 at 1:30 p.m.
Senate 3/24/2015 3/25/2015 Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/26/2015 3/23/2015 Favorable Report Adopted 50
Senate 3/26/2015 3/23/2015 Second Reading Passed 50
Senate 3/27/2015 3/24/2015 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 51
House 3/27/2015 3/25/2015 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations 55
House 4/10/2015 4/10/2015 Rereferred to Ways and Means
House 4/10/2015 4/10/2015 Hearing 4/11 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/11/2015 4/13/2015 Favorable Report by Ways and Means
House 4/13/2015 4/07/2015 Favorable Report Adopted 68
House 4/13/2015 4/07/2015 Second Reading Passed 68
House 4/13/2015 4/08/2015 Third Reading Passed (136-0) 69
Senate 4/13/2015 4/07/2015 Returned Passed 65
Post Passage 5/12/2015 5/12/2015 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 211
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM