Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Health Insurance - Pharmacy Benefits Managers - Specialty Drugs
Sponsored by
Senator Pugh
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the State Board of Pharmacy, in consultation with the University of Maryland School of Pharmacy, to specify the prescription drugs that may be considered specialty drugs by a pharmacy benefits manager; requiring the Board to publish in the Maryland Register a list of the prescription drugs that may be considered specialty drugs; requiring a pharmacy benefits manager to designate on a formulary only prescription drugs that are on the list of specialty drugs published by the Board; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0736
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/12/2013
Legislative Date
2/13/2013
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/20/2013
Legislative Date
2/20/2013
Action
Rereferred to Finance and Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/22/2013
Legislative Date
2/22/2013
Action
Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/12/2013 2/13/2013 First Reading Senate Rules
Senate 2/20/2013 2/20/2013 Rereferred to Finance and Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/22/2013 2/22/2013 Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance)
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   15-1632 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM