Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Somerset County Sanitary Commission - Enforcement of Liens - Tax Sale Authorization
Sponsored by
Senator Mathias
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 212
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing the Somerset County Sanitary Commission to request the county tax collector to conduct a sale of real property to enforce a lien representing specified unpaid benefit assessments or other specified charges in accordance with the same procedures governing the sale of property for delinquent property taxes; and authorizing the tax collector in Somerset County to conduct a county tax sale for the purpose of enforcing a specified lien.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1273
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/10/2015
Legislative Date
3/10/2015
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/10/2015
Legislative Date
3/10/2015
Action
Motion Rules Suspended for late introduction (Senator Mathias) Adopted
Proceedings
39
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/10/2015
Legislative Date
3/10/2015
Action
Referred Senate Rules
Proceedings
39
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2015
Legislative Date
3/16/2015
Action
Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2015
Legislative Date
3/18/2015
Action
Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2015
Legislative Date
3/20/2015
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2015
Legislative Date
3/20/2015
Action
Hearing 3/24 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/24/2015
Legislative Date
3/25/2015
Action
Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/26/2015
Legislative Date
3/23/2015
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
50
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/26/2015
Legislative Date
3/23/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
50
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/27/2015
Legislative Date
3/24/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
51
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2015
Legislative Date
3/25/2015
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
55
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2015
Legislative Date
4/11/2015
Action
Rereferred to Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/13/2015
Action
Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/08/2015
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
69
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/08/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
69
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/09/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
70
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/14/2015
Legislative Date
4/10/2015
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
68
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/12/2015
Legislative Date
5/12/2015
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 212
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 3/10/2015 3/10/2015 First Reading Senate Rules
Senate 3/10/2015 3/10/2015 Motion Rules Suspended for late introduction (Senator Mathias) Adopted 39
Senate 3/10/2015 3/10/2015 Referred Senate Rules 39
Senate 3/13/2015 3/16/2015 Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/18/2015 3/18/2015 Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/20/2015 3/20/2015 Hearing cancelled
Senate 3/20/2015 3/20/2015 Hearing 3/24 at 1:30 p.m.
Senate 3/24/2015 3/25/2015 Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/26/2015 3/23/2015 Favorable Report Adopted 50
Senate 3/26/2015 3/23/2015 Second Reading Passed 50
Senate 3/27/2015 3/24/2015 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 51
House 3/27/2015 3/25/2015 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations 55
House 4/11/2015 4/11/2015 Rereferred to Environment and Transportation
House 4/13/2015 4/13/2015 Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
House 4/13/2015 4/08/2015 Favorable Report Adopted 69
House 4/13/2015 4/08/2015 Second Reading Passed 69
House 4/13/2015 4/09/2015 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 70
Senate 4/14/2015 4/10/2015 Returned Passed 68
Post Passage 5/12/2015 5/12/2015 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 212
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   9-658 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM