Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Commercial Fishing and Seafood Operations - Nuisance Actions - Exemption
Sponsored by
Senators Hershey, Colburn, and Shank
Status
In the House - Rereferred to Environmental Matters
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Expanding the application of specified provisions of law relating to the protection of agricultural operations from nuisance actions under specified circumstances to apply to specified commercial fishing and seafood operations; exempting specified commercial fishing and seafood operations from nuisance lawsuits; authorizing an appeal of a local agency's decision on a nuisance complaint against a commercial fishing or seafood operation to a circuit court; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1153
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0163 Session: 2013 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2014
Legislative Date
1/31/2014
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2014
Legislative Date
2/05/2014
Action
Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/24/2014
Legislative Date
3/25/2014
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/25/2014
Legislative Date
3/18/2014
Action
Favorable
Proceedings
52
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/25/2014
Legislative Date
3/18/2014
Action
Special Order until 3/26 (Senator Kelley) Adopted
Proceedings
52
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/26/2014
Legislative Date
3/19/2014
Action
Favorable Report Adopted (34-12)
Proceedings
53
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/26/2014
Legislative Date
3/19/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
53
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/27/2014
Legislative Date
3/20/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (38-9)
Proceedings
54
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2014
Legislative Date
3/22/2014
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
58
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
4/07/2014
Action
Rereferred to Environmental Matters
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/03/2014 1/31/2014 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/05/2014 2/05/2014 Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/24/2014 3/25/2014 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/25/2014 3/18/2014 Favorable 52
Senate 3/25/2014 3/18/2014 Special Order until 3/26 (Senator Kelley) Adopted 52
Senate 3/26/2014 3/19/2014 Favorable Report Adopted (34-12) 53
Senate 3/26/2014 3/19/2014 Second Reading Passed 53
Senate 3/27/2014 3/20/2014 Third Reading Passed (38-9) 54
House 3/27/2014 3/22/2014 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations 58
House 4/07/2014 4/07/2014 Rereferred to Environmental Matters
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM