Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Video Lottery Terminal Revenues - Standardbred Owners and Trainers - Benefit Programs
Sponsored by
Senators King and Miller
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 213
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing the organization that represents a majority of the standardbred owners and trainers in the State to apply to the Secretary of Labor, Licensing, and Regulation for the reimbursement of specified expenditures not to exceed 2% of all open purses; providing that the reimbursement amount be deducted from the Purse Dedication Account; specifying programs for which reimbursement is allowable; etc.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Opposite:
Ways and Means  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2015
Legislative Date
3/12/2015
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2015
Legislative Date
3/12/2015
Action
Motion Rules Suspended for late introduction (Senator King) Adopted
Proceedings
41
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2015
Legislative Date
3/12/2015
Action
Referred Senate Rules
Proceedings
41
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2015
Legislative Date
3/16/2015
Action
Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2015
Legislative Date
3/13/2015
Action
Hearing 3/18 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2015
Legislative Date
3/19/2015
Action
Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2015
Legislative Date
3/19/2015
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
46
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2015
Legislative Date
3/19/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
46
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2015
Legislative Date
3/20/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
47
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2015
Legislative Date
3/19/2015
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
49
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/23/2015
Legislative Date
3/23/2015
Action
Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2015
Legislative Date
4/09/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2015
Legislative Date
4/03/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {105866/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2015
Legislative Date
4/03/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2015
Legislative Date
4/06/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (135-1)
Proceedings
67
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/05/2015
Action
Senate Concur - House Amendments
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/05/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/05/2015
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/12/2015
Legislative Date
5/12/2015
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 213
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 3/12/2015 3/12/2015 First Reading Senate Rules
Senate 3/12/2015 3/12/2015 Motion Rules Suspended for late introduction (Senator King) Adopted 41
Senate 3/12/2015 3/12/2015 Referred Senate Rules 41
Senate 3/13/2015 3/16/2015 Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/13/2015 3/13/2015 Hearing 3/18 at 1:30 p.m.
Senate 3/18/2015 3/19/2015 Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/19/2015 3/19/2015 Favorable Report Adopted 46
Senate 3/19/2015 3/19/2015 Second Reading Passed 46
Senate 3/20/2015 3/20/2015 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 47
House 3/20/2015 3/19/2015 First Reading Ways and Means 49
House 3/23/2015 3/23/2015 Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/08/2015 4/09/2015 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 4/09/2015 4/03/2015 Favorable with Amendments {105866/1 Report Adopted 64
House 4/09/2015 4/03/2015 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 64
House 4/11/2015 4/06/2015 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (135-1) 67
Senate 4/13/2015 4/05/2015 Senate Concur - House Amendments 63
Senate 4/13/2015 4/05/2015 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 63
Senate 4/13/2015 4/05/2015 Passed Enrolled 63
Post Passage 5/12/2015 5/12/2015 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 213
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   9-1A-28.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM